NJ A1552 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A5664
Note: Carry Over of previous S4016

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for legal representation for residential lessees and tenants in any removal or eviction proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for legal representation for residential lessees and tenants in any removal or eviction proceeding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5664 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S4016 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2177 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback