NJ A1515 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1551
Note: Carry Foward to future A3441
Note: Carry Over of previous A4656
Note: Carry Over of previous S2963
Note: Carry Over of previous A2179
Note: Carry Over of previous A5886
Note: Carry Foward to future A3441
Note: Carry Over of previous A4656
Note: Carry Over of previous S2963
Note: Carry Over of previous A2179
Note: Carry Over of previous A5886
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program for creation of certain local civilian review boards to review police operations and conduct.
Title
Establishes pilot program for creation of certain local civilian review boards to review police operations and conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1515 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1515 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4656 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
S2963 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2295 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2179 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A5886 (Carry Over) 2021-07-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.145.
A1515 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4656 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
S2963 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2295 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2179 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A5886 (Carry Over) 2021-07-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.145.