NJ A4656 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A1515
Note: Carry Foward to future S2295

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes creation of local civilian review boards to review police operations and conduct; appropriates $800,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes creation of local civilian review boards to review police operations and conduct; appropriates $800,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
2021-06-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-06-16AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2021-03-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-09-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4656 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
A4656 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
S2963 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback