NJ A1506 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2236
Note: Carry Over of previous A2453
Note: Carry Over of previous A2453
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (72-1-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (72-1-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits restaurants without a liquor license to advertise that they are BYOB or a winery salesroom.
Title
Permits restaurants without a liquor license to advertise that they are BYOB or a winery salesroom.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-1-1) |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1506 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (72-1-1)
A2453 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - INT 1RA REF ARO
S3016 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
A2453 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - INT 1RA REF ARO
S3016 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading