NJ A1495 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5604
Note: Carry Over of previous S4161
Note: Carry Over of previous S4161
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Approved P.L.2024, c.3.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Approved P.L.2024, c.3.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts receipts from sales of materials, supplies, and services for certain affordable housing projects from sales and use tax.
Title
Exempts receipts from sales of materials, supplies, and services for certain affordable housing projects from sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1484 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1484 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2024, c.3. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-6) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Substituted for S1484 (2R) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-8-0) |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5604 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
S4161 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1484 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - Substituted by A1495 (2R)
S4161 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1484 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - Substituted by A1495 (2R)