NJ A1427 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits increase in municipal free public library tax upon voter approval.
Title
Permits increase in municipal free public library tax upon voter approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2633 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.260. |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2633 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2016-09-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (52-14-5) |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2633 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A1427