NJ A1405 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A397
Note: Carry Foward to future S152
Note: Carry Over of previous A567
Note: Carry Over of previous S3079
Note: Carry Foward to future S152
Note: Carry Over of previous A567
Note: Carry Over of previous S3079
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that amounts remaining in inactive Internet gaming accounts will be abandoned property after three years under unclaimed property law.
Title
Provides that amounts remaining in inactive Internet gaming accounts will be abandoned property after three years under unclaimed property law.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Auth [R] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] |
Rep. Edward Thomson [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1405 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A1405 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A567 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S3079 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1707 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1405 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A567 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S3079 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1707 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1405 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1405_I1.HTM |