NJ A1400 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4451

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises law governing Class Three special law enforcement officer.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises law governing Class Three special law enforcement officer.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-12-10AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4451 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3245 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback