NJ S3245 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A1400 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A1400 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law governing Class Three special law enforcement officers.
Title
Revises law governing Class Three special law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Substituted by A1400 (ACS) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1400 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.51.