NJ A1305 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1698
Note: Carry Foward to future S3625
Note: Carry Foward to future S3625
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain requirements for a State entity planting vegetation in certain circumstances; provides for NJ businesses providing such vegetation.**
Title
Establishes certain requirements for a State entity planting vegetation in certain circumstances; provides for NJ businesses providing such vegetation.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Assembly Substitution (Dancer) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1305 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1305 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1305 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee