NJ A1271 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A550
Note: Carry Over of previous A5666
Note: Carry Over of previous A5666
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S2304 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S2304 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits excused absences for students who attend civic events.
Title
Permits excused absences for students who attend civic events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S2304 (2R) |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1271 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S2304 (2R)
A5666 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2304 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.274.
A5666 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2304 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.274.