NJ A1186 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-15 - Approved P.L.2015, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-15 - Approved P.L.2015, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain veterinarians at for-profit veterinary facilities to provide written notification concerning absence of supervision after normal business hours; designated as "Betsy's Law." *
Title
Requires certain veterinarians at for-profit veterinary facilities to provide written notification concerning absence of supervision after normal business hours; designated as "Betsy's Law." *
Sponsors
Rep. David Wolfe [R] | Rep. Gregory McGuckin [R] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] |
Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.110. |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Substituted for S903 (SS) |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-1) |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S903 (Same As) 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A1186 (ACS)