NJ A1110 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4376

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S782 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases workers' compensation for loss of hand or foot.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases workers' compensation for loss of hand or foot.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-16AssemblySubstituted by S782 (2R)
2019-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-12-09AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4376 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S782 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.387.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback