NJ A1094 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3480

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - Approved P.L.2019, c.199.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits employer inquiries about worker's wage and salary experience.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits employer inquiries about worker's wage and salary experience.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3516 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-25SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.199.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-9)
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted for S3516
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (53-24-2)
2019-02-14AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3480 (Carry Over) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S3516 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A1094 (ACS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback