NJ A3480 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1094
Note: Carry Foward to future S3516
Note: Carry Foward to future S3516
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns employer inquiries about worker's wage and salary experience.*
Title
Concerns employer inquiries about worker's wage and salary experience.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2536 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-9) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Substituted for S2536 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-19-7) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3480 (Carry Over) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A3480 (Carry Over) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S2536 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A3480/4119 (ACS)
A3480 (Carry Over) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S2536 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A3480/4119 (ACS)