NJ A1061 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4937

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOH and DHS to identify and take appropriate steps to secure federal sources of funding to support maternal mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOH and DHS to identify and take appropriate steps to secure federal sources of funding to support maternal mental health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4937 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S890 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback