NJ A4937 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1061
Note: Carry Foward to future S890
Note: Carry Foward to future S890
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH and DHS to identify and take appropriate steps to secure federal sources of funding to support maternal mental health.*
Title
Requires DOH and DHS to identify and take appropriate steps to secure federal sources of funding to support maternal mental health.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4937 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4937 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3364 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4937 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3364 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading