NJ S890 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3364

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOH and DHS to identify and take appropriate steps to secure federal sources of funding to support maternal mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOH and DHS to identify and take appropriate steps to secure federal sources of funding to support maternal mental health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-11-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
2020-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2020-09-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3364 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1061 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback