NJ A1057 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2900
Note: Carry Foward to future S3105
Note: Carry Over of previous A1249
Note: Carry Over of previous S1181
Note: Carry Foward to future S3105
Note: Carry Over of previous A1249
Note: Carry Over of previous S1181
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Succeed in New Jersey" student loan reimbursement program for certain New Jersey residents employed in designated fields.
Title
Establishes "Succeed in New Jersey" student loan reimbursement program for certain New Jersey residents employed in designated fields.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1057 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A1057 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A1249 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1181 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2595 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1057 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A1249 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1181 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2595 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1057 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1057_I1.HTM |