NJ S3105 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1057
Note: Carry Over of previous S2595
Note: Carry Over of previous S2595
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Succeed in New Jersey" student loan reimbursement program for certain New Jersey residents employed in designated fields.
Title
Establishes "Succeed in New Jersey" student loan reimbursement program for certain New Jersey residents employed in designated fields.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2900 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A1057 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2595 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1057 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2595 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3105 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3500/3105_I1.HTM |