NJ A1028 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A2957
Note: Carry Over of previous S2065

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-03-24 - Substituted by S1548 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to adopt policies concerning student use of sunscreen and sun-protective clothing at school and school-sponsored functions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to adopt policies concerning student use of sunscreen and sun-protective clothing at school and school-sponsored functions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-03-24AssemblySubstituted by S1548 (1R)
2024-10-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2024-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2957 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2065 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S1548 (Same As) 2025-03-31 - Approved P.L.2025, c.37.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback