NJ A2957 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1028
Note: Carry Foward to future S1548
Note: Carry Over of previous A3186
Note: Carry Over of previous S1501
Note: Carry Foward to future S1548
Note: Carry Over of previous A3186
Note: Carry Over of previous S1501
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to adopt policies concerning student use of sunscreen and sun-protective clothing at school and school-sponsored functions.
Title
Requires school districts to adopt policies concerning student use of sunscreen and sun-protective clothing at school and school-sponsored functions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2957 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2957 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3186 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1501 (Carry Over) 2020-12-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2065 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2957 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3186 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1501 (Carry Over) 2020-12-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2065 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2957 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2957_I1.HTM |