NJ A1028 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2629
Note: Carry Over of previous A492
Note: Carry Over of previous S1475
Note: Carry Over of previous A492
Note: Carry Over of previous S1475
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits awarding of economic development subsidy to business if payment of principal and interest on previously awarded loan or loan guarantee is greater than 24 months overdue.
Title
Prohibits awarding of economic development subsidy to business if payment of principal and interest on previously awarded loan or loan guarantee is greater than 24 months overdue.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] |
Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Gerard Scharfenberger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1028 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A492 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1475 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2327 (Same As) 2022-11-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A492 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1475 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2327 (Same As) 2022-11-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1028 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1028_I1.HTM |