NJ A10 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.56.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.56.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises "New Jersey Transportation Trust Fund Authority Act"; establishes State Transportation Infrastructure Bank within NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust; renames NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Title
Revises "New Jersey Transportation Trust Fund Authority Act"; establishes State Transportation Infrastructure Bank within NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust; renames NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2412 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-29 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-29 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-14 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.56. |
2016-10-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-27-0) |
2016-10-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-14) |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Substituted for S2412 (3R) |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-10) (Sarlo) |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-22-0) |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (61-14-0) |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2412 (Same As) 2016-10-07 - Substituted by A10 (4R)