NJ S2412 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-07 - Substituted by A10 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-07 - Substituted by A10 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises "New Jersey Transportation Trust Fund Authority Act"; establishes State Transportation Infrastructure Bank within NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust; renames NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Title
Revises "New Jersey Transportation Trust Fund Authority Act"; establishes State Transportation Infrastructure Bank within NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust; renames NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-07 | Senate | Substituted by A10 (4R) |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-9) (Sarlo) |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A10 (Same As) 2016-10-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.56.