NH SCR1 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Senate Sen. Lasky Concurs with House Amendment 1285h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.631
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Senate Sen. Lasky Concurs with House Amendment 1285h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.631
Summary
Urging Congress to fund the development and implementation of a comprehensive health care delivery system to enhance the level of specialty care for New Hampshire's veterans.
Title
Urging Congress to fund the development and implementation of a comprehensive health care delivery system to enhance the level of specialty care for New Hampshire's veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Senate Sen. Lasky Concurs with House Amendment 1285h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.631 | |
2010-04-21 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1285h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1662 | |
2010-04-21 | House Amendment #1285h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1662 | |
2010-04-13 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #1285h (New Title); House Calendar 31, PG.1575-1576 | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1285h (NT) for April 21 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1530 | |
2010-03-31 | House Executive Session: 4/8/2010 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-03-23 | House Public Hearing: 4/1/2010 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to State Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 18, PG.1017 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 2, Pg.27 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 22Y-0N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 2, Pg.20 | |
2010-01-12 | Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass 1/13/10; Senate Calendar 2A | |
2010-01-07 | Senate Hearing: January 12, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Election Law and Veterans' Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.9 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2805&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |