NH SB99 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2015; Chapter 0267; Effective 07/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2015; Chapter 0267; Effective 07/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study allowing the sampling of beer or wine at farmers markets, establishing a committee to study powdered or crystalline alcohol, and relative to the definition of alcohol.
Title
Establishing a committee to study allowing the sampling of beer or wine at farmers markets, establishing a committee to study powdered or crystalline alcohol, and relative to the definition of alcohol.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Barbara French [D] |
Rep. Geoffrey Hirsch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2015; Chapter 0267; Effective 07/20/2015 |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-07-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2142 |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2341e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2341e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2140 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2238c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2238c: Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 54, PG. 2105 |
2015-06-16 | House | Conference Committee Report #2015-2238c; House Amendment; Filed |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Feltes Replaces Senator Pierce |
2015-06-11 | House | Conferee Change: Rep Jones Replaces Rep Tucker; House Journal 46, PG. 1990 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: === RESCHEDULED === 6/16/2015, 2:00 p.m., Room 103, State House |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: === CANCELLED === 6/11/2015, 10:45 a.m., Room 100, State House |
2015-06-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Hunt, Tucker, Abel, Biggie (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954 |
2015-06-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Prescott, Bradley, and Pierce |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1683h, New Title; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1683h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1822-1823 |
2015-06-03 | House | Amendment #1683h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1822-1823 |
2015-05-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1683h (NT) for Jun 3 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1628 |
2015-05-13 | House | Executive Session: 5/19/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-05-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-15 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 4/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-02 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane amendment #1235h: 4/8/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0055s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0055s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0055s, 1/29/15; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |