NH SB94 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Pending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Pending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making a capital appropriation for affordable housing.
Title
Making a capital appropriation for affordable housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Pending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0594s, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0594s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0594s, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/22/2017, Room 100, State House, 03:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Capital Budget; Senate Journal 5 |