NH SB94 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/15/2013; Chapter 0230; Effective 09/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/15/2013; Chapter 0230; Effective 09/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to portable electronics insurance.
Title
Relative to portable electronics insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] | Rep. Mary Walz [D] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
Rep. Michael McCarthy [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/15/2013; Chapter 0230; Effective 09/13/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1711 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Concur with House Amendment 1451h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1451h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1388 |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment #1451h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1388 |
2013-05-02 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1451h; House Calendar36, PG.1215 |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1451h for May 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1196 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 5/1/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/30/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/11/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0757s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0757s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0757s, 3/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 2/19/13, Room 100, State House, 1:50 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |