NH SB86 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 11:30 am in Legislative Office Building 205
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study programs for serving individuals with certain developmental and mental health disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study programs for serving individuals with certain developmental and mental health disabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced 03/14/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-0607s and 2019-0739s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-0739s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0607s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0607s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-14SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback