NH SB86 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0209; Effective 09/08/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0209; Effective 09/08/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of banks, trusts, and credit unions by the banking department.
Title
Relative to the regulation of banks, trusts, and credit unions by the banking department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0209; Effective 09/08/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2207e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2207e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 5 |
2017-05-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/01/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 6 |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-05-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 01:20 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-05-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/10/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-04-18 | House | Public Hearing: 05/03/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 27 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2017-1049s and 2017-1170s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Innis Floor Amendment #2017-1170s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1049s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1049s, 03/30/2017; |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 86 to the beginning of Thursday 03/30/2017 Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017; |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove SB 86 from the Consent Calendar; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1049s, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |