NH SB81 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB81
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Summary
Adopting omnibus legislation on chartered public schools.
Title
Adopting omnibus legislation on chartered public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/25/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB81 (Carry Over) 2021-10-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=819&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=SB81 |