NH SB8 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to appropriations for nursing homes.
Title
Relative to appropriations for nursing homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment 0843s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Sen. Watters Floor Amendment 0841s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment 0843s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment 0843s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Sen. Watters Floor Amendment 0841s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment 0843s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | House | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: === RECONVENE === 6/18/2015, 9:00 a.m., Room 103, State House |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: === RECONVENE === 6/15/2015, 4:30 p.m., Room 102, Legislative Office Building === RECESSED === |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: === RECONVENE === 6/12/2015, 10:00 a.m., Room 103, State House === RECESSED === |
2015-06-09 | House | Conferee Change: Rep Nordgren Replaces Rep Rosenwald; House Journal 44, PG. 1953 |
2015-06-08 | House | Conferee Change: Rep McKinney Replaces Rep Byron; House Journal 44, PG. 1952 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/10/2015, 1:30 p.m., Room 103, State House === RECESSED === |
2015-06-03 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Barry, D. McGuire, Byron, Rosenwald; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Forrester, Little, and Hosmer |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1501h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1501h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1771-1772 |
2015-05-06 | House | Amendment #1501h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1771-1772 |
2015-04-30 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-04-30 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1501h for May 6 (Vote 13-10; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG. 1512 |
2015-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-21 | House | Continued Division III Work Session: 4/22/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-16 | House | Division III Work Session: 4/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211==RECESSED== |
2015-04-08 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 4/16/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-02 | House | Division III Work Session: 4/9/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0700s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sen. D’Allesandro Floor Amendment 0843s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration of vote on Floor Amendment 0843s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Watters Floor Amendment #2015-0841s, New Title, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sen. D’Allesandro Floor Amendment #2015-0843s, Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0700s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0700s, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Special Order SB 8-FN-L to after lunch, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0700s, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/3/15, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 6 |