NH SB78 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2019; Chapter 0086; Effective 08/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2019; Chapter 0086; Effective 08/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public utility customer data.
Title
Relative to public utility customer data.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2019; Chapter 0086; Effective 08/17/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 93 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 18 |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |