NH SB77 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Lay on Table (Rep. Bixby): Motion Adopted DV 202-147 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to costs of care for animals seized in cruelty cases and prohibiting the future ownership of animals in certain animal cruelty cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to costs of care for animals seized in cruelty cases and prohibiting the future ownership of animals in certain animal cruelty cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseLay on Table (Rep. Bixby): Motion Adopted DV 202-147 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 63
2019-05-08HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Rogers) 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 2
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1723h (NT) for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
2019-04-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/30/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2019-1530h: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-08HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-02House==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/23/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0660s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0660s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0660s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-31SenateHearing: 02/07/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback