NH SB75 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0264; Effective 11/21/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0264; Effective 11/21/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to games of chance.
Title
Relative to games of chance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0264; Effective 11/21/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1716 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2198e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2198e Adopted; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2150c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2150c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1674-1675 |
2013-06-20 | House | Conference Committee Report #2013-2150c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar47, PG.1537 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/19/13 1:00 p.m., Room 102, Legislative Office Building |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/2013, 1:00 p.m., Room 103, State House ==RECESSED== |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Lovejoy, J.Kelley, Butynski, and Sapareto [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1652 |
2013-06-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1652 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Odell, Rausch, Hosmer |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Odell Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1952h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1952h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1574-1575 |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment #1952h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1574-1575 |
2013-05-30 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1952h; House Calendar42, PG.1447-1449 |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1952h for June 5 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1430 |
2013-05-29 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/29/2013 Legislative Office Building 202 5 Minutes After House Session |
2013-05-22 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==RECESSED== |
2013-05-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/23/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 4/24/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 4/18/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 35, PG.1191 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/28/13; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0793s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0793s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0793s, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/13, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 4 |