NH SB749 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Hearing: 03/10/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 10
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to non-covered services under dental insurance plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to non-covered services under dental insurance plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateHearing: 03/10/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback