NH SB727 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Holocaust and genocide studies legislation and establishing a commission to study genocide education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Holocaust and genocide studies legislation and establishing a commission to study genocide education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseIntroduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
2020-03-12SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1021s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1021s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-12SenateSpecial Order to the Beginning of Educations and Workforce Development, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-11SenateSpecial Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6
2020-03-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1021s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10
2020-02-05Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 8
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback