NH SB68 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB68
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring an employer to provide reasonable accommodations for pregnant employees.
Title
Requiring an employer to provide reasonable accommodations for pregnant employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-11-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study SB68 10/29/2021 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 22 |
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-10-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-08-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-05-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643 |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 03/30/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99157160886 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/18/2021; Senate Journal 5 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/18/2021; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/26/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB68 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308