NH SB67 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0157; Effective 09/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0157; Effective 09/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to changes to certain weights and measures statutes.
Title
Relative to changes to certain weights and measures statutes.
Sponsors
Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0157; Effective 09/26/2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 16 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 2 |
2023-05-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/11/2023 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-03 | House | Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 10:10 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0569s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0569s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0569s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2023, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |