NH SB63 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB63
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - III. Remainder Effective 05/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - III. Remainder Effective 05/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to record management of abuse and neglect reports, establishing a pilot program regarding electronic storage of abuse and neglect records, and establishing the excess appropriation allocation account in the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to record management of abuse and neglect reports, establishing a pilot program regarding electronic storage of abuse and neglect records, and establishing the excess appropriation allocation account in the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] |
Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0260s (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0260s (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | II. Section 8 Effective 07/01/2019 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | I. Section 5 Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/23/2018; Chapter 0057 |
2018-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1959e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1959e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1649h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1649h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1649h (NT) for 04/26/2018 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 11 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/11/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Finance 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 2 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1166h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 2 |
2018-04-05 | House | Amendment # 2018-1166h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 2 |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1166h for 04/05/2018 (Vote 11-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 3 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0260s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0260s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0260s, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-2532s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-2532s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2532s, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Without Objection, SB 63 is vacated from Finance and referred to Health and Human Services; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2017; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Carry Over) 2017-12-05 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2532s