NH SB63 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB63
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-05 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2532s
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-05 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2532s
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to record management of abuse and neglect reports.
Title
Relative to record management of abuse and neglect reports.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2532s |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Without Objection, SB 63 is vacated from Finance and referred to Health and Human Services; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2017; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Carry Over) 2017-12-05 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2532s