NH SB62 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0149; Effective 08/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to drivers' licenses for persons without a permanent address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to drivers' licenses for persons without a permanent address.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0149; Effective 08/11/2015
2015-06-03SenateEnrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17
2015-06-03HouseEnrolled
2015-05-14SenateSen. Stiles Concurs with House Amendment #1353h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
2015-05-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1353h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1757
2015-05-06HouseAmendment #1353h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1757
2015-04-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1353h for May 6 (Vote 13-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG. 1509
2015-04-22HouseContinued Executive Session: 4/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2015-04-14HouseExecutive Session: 4/21/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203==RECESSED==
2015-03-26HousePublic Hearing: 4/7/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2015-03-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 26, PG. 1274
2015-03-05SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7
2015-02-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11
2015-01-26SenateHearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/5/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8
2015-01-22SenateHearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback