NH SB614 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the department of transportation from the notice requirement for lessors of real or personal property owned by the state or its political subdivisions.
Title
Exempting the department of transportation from the notice requirement for lessors of real or personal property owned by the state or its political subdivisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 8 P. 227 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0741s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0741s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0741s, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |