NH SB61 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reconsider (Rep. Sullivan): Motion Failed DV 163-201 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reconsider (Rep. Sullivan): Motion Failed DV 163-201 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting collective bargaining agreements that require employees to join a labor union.
Title
Prohibiting collective bargaining agreements that require employees to join a labor union.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 196 N: 178 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 175 N: 199 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - Table (Y: 168 N: 207 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 175 N: 199 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - Table (Y: 168 N: 207 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Sullivan): Motion Failed DV 163-201 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 183 |
2021-06-03 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Soucy): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 196-178 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 180 |
2021-06-03 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed DV 171-204 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 180 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1047h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 175-199 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 178 |
2021-06-03 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Infantine): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-207 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 176 |
2021-06-03 | House | Reconsider Amendment 2021-1835h (Rep. Bordes): Motion Failed DV 178-193 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 176 |
2021-06-03 | House | FLAM # 2021-1835h (Reps. Abramson, Binford, Love): Amendment Failed DV 183-190 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 175 |
2021-06-03 | House | Amendment # 2021-1047h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 175 |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1047h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 26 |
2021-03-30 | House | Executive Session: 03/30/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91970098494 |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 03/25/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98630616522 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/11/2021; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/26/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3 |