NH SB60 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Remote Hearing: 02/09/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the transport of an open container of marijuana in a motor vehicle or OHRV.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the transport of an open container of marijuana in a motor vehicle or OHRV.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04SenateRemote Hearing: 02/09/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback