NH SB60 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0061; Effective 06/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0061; Effective 06/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to assisted living facilities and landlord tenant law.
Title
Relative to assisted living facilities and landlord tenant law.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Thomas Donovan [D] | Rep. James Grenier [R] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] |
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0061; Effective 06/06/2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1247 |
2013-04-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar33, PG.1096-1097 |
2013-04-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 24 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1096-1097 |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0205s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0205s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0205s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |