NH SB562 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing the waiver of fees for reinstatement of a driver's license and registration in cases of demonstrated financial hardship.
Title
Allowing the waiver of fees for reinstatement of a driver's license and registration in cases of demonstrated financial hardship.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Matthews [R] | Rep. John Sytek [R] | Rep. William Hatch [D] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 2 |