NH SB56 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 05/18/2010; Chapter 0031
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 05/18/2010; Chapter 0031
Summary
Expanding the duties of the commission to study issues relative to groundwater withdrawals.
Title
Expanding the duties of the commission to study issues relative to groundwater withdrawals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 05/18/2010; Chapter 0031 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-05 | House Enrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1659 | |
2010-04-15 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 21 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1528 | |
2010-04-07 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-03-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 18, PG.1016 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 2, Pg.27 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0033s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 2, Pg.21 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Committee Amendment 0033s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-01-07 | Senate Committee Report, Ought to Pass with Amendment 0033s, New Title 1/13/10; Senate Calendar 2 Pg.2 | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 11, Pg.204 | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Committee Report; Rereferred to Committee; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Hearing; === RECONVENE === March 12, 2009, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2009-02-05 | Senate Hearing; === RECESSED === February 5, 2009, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m. | |
2009-01-29 | Senate Hearing; === RECONVENE === February 5, 2009, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2009-01-29 | Senate Hearing; === RECESSED === January 29, 2009, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:10 a.m. | |
2009-01-23 | Senate Hearing; January 29, 2009, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 | |
2009-01-08 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy, Environment and Economic Development; Senate Journal 2, Pg.24 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=968&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |