NH SB551 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to making an appropriation for rail trail project matching funds.
Title
Relative to making an appropriation for rail trail project matching funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 103, State House, 01:10 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |